Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
06.01.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.12.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.04.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.11.2019 | Change - representative |