Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022388918 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 | WO2020EP82008 | 13.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4057829 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | C0 | EP4057829 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | B1 | EP4057829 | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 | WO2020EP82008 | 13.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3155098 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 | WO2020EP82008 | 13.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021094510 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3821716 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR120460 | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19209468 | 15.11.2019 |