EP3639927 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROSTATIC PAINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurosider S.a.S. di Milli Ottavio & C. Piazzale Thailandia, 6 58100 Grosseto (GR) / IT | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milli, Ottavio Via Liri 68/C 58100 Grosseto / IT | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Nesti, Antonio, et al Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Arnolfo, 27 50121 Firenze / IT | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19209766.5 | 08.02.2013 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | IT2012FI00205 | 10.10.2012 Original published format: IT FI20120205 | [2020/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639927 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3639927 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/03, B05B5/16, B05B7/14, B05B7/16, B05D1/06, B05B7/24, B05B5/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
B05B5/001 (EP,CN,US);
B05B5/03 (RU);
B01D53/02 (US);
B01D53/229 (US);
B05B5/032 (EP,CN,US);
B05B5/08 (RU);
B05B5/1683 (EP,CN,US);
B05B7/2491 (EP,US);
B05D1/06 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTROSTATISCHES LACKIEREN | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROSTATIC PAINTING | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PEINTURE ÉLECTROSTATIQUE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 08.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13715453.0 / EP2906353 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | IE | 08.02.2023 | LU | 08.02.2023 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/49] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3951340 (POINT MARCEL) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 16 ** column 2, line 3 - line 34 *; | [A]US5167714 (GIMBEN DALE N [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 22 *; | [Y]US5370911 (THRONE JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - line 56 *; | [A]EP1258279 (EUROSIDER S A S DI MILLI OTTAV [IT]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]EP1332784 (EUROSIDER S A S DI MILLI OTTAV [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202008006882U (WALMEC SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010077784 (SUZUKI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2010298069 (GOODWIN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0075] * |