EP3823136 - ROTOR FOR A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xylem Europe GmbH Bleicheplatz 6 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REFFO, Fabio via X Giugno 17 36077 Altavilla Vic.na / IT | 02 /
BICEGO, Riccardo via Conti Gomberto 16 36070 Castelgomberto / IT | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19209788.9 | 18.11.2019 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823136 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/24, H02K29/03 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
H02K29/03 (EP);
H02K1/279 (US);
H02K1/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE SYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2021/20] | English: | ROTOR FOR A SYNCHRONOUS MACHINE | [2021/20] | French: | ROTOR POUR UNE MACHINE SYNCHRONE | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 09.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008224558 (IONEL DAN M [US]) [X] 1-3,6-13,15 * paragraphs [0056] - [0058] - [0078]; figures 1,2,6,14 * [Y] 4,5,14; | [A]EP2991207 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8* paragraph [0025]; figure 6 *; | [Y]EP3300231 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 4,5,14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0037]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [XY]US2018198356 (GIERAS JACEK F [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,12,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] , [0023]; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5,14 |