EP3824948 - A PLANNING AND/OR CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A NEUROMODULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONWARD Medical N.V. Schimmelt 2-16 5611 ZX Eindhoven / NL | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states ONWARD Medical N.V. High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states ONWARD Medical B.V. High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUNS, Robin c/o GTX medical B.V. High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BAKKER, Jurriaan c/o GTX medical B.V. High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CABAN, Miroslav Rue de Crissier 1 1020 Renens / CH | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19209911.7 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824948 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/372, G16H20/30, G16H40/63 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
A61N1/3606 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (US);
A61N1/0551 (US);
A61N1/36062 (EP,US);
A61N1/36125 (US);
A61N1/36128 (US);
A61N1/36157 (EP);
A61N1/36182 (EP);
A61N1/36185 (US);
A61N1/36189 (US);
A61N1/37247 (EP,US);
A61N1/37282 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANUNGS- UND/ODER STEUERSYSTEM FÜR EIN NEUROMODULATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/21] | English: | A PLANNING AND/OR CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A NEUROMODULATION SYSTEM | [2021/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PLANIFICATION ET/OU DE COMMANDE POUR UN SYSTÈME DE NEUROMODULATION | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012041518 (KIM CHESTER [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0060] - [0075]; figures 7-10B *; | [X]US2018056078 (KASHYAP DHEERENDRA RAGHAVENDRA [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0125] - [0150]; figures 18A-21; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2018039296 (BOSTON SCIENT NEUROMODULATION CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0109] , [0143] - [0144]; figures 17,28-30; claims 1-13 *; | [X]US2018085583 (ZHANG TIANHE [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0137] - [0150]; figures 21-23B *; | [X]US2018193655 (ZHANG TIANHE [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0080] - [0087]; claims 7-8 *; | [A]US2019160294 (PETERSON ERIK J [US], et al) [A] 1-19* figures 3-4 * | by applicant | US2012006793 | US8108051 | US2013096662 | EP3013411 | EP3285855 | EP3527258 |