EP3686680 - IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kigawa, Kohei c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19210032.9 | 19.11.2019 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | JP20190011395 | 25.01.2019 Original published format: JP 2019011395 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686680 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01, G03G15/00, B41M5/00, B44C1/17, D06P5/24 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
G03G15/6585 (EP,US);
B41M5/50 (EP);
B44C1/1725 (EP);
D06P1/0012 (EP);
D06P5/003 (EP);
D06P5/007 (EP);
G03G15/0178 (US);
G03G15/0194 (EP);
G03G15/161 (US);
G03G15/6591 (EP,US);
G03G9/0926 (EP);
B41M2205/10 (EP);
B41M5/502 (US);
G03G2215/00523 (US);
G03G2215/00527 (EP);
G03G9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/31] | English: | IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND IMAGE FORMING METHOD | [2020/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 01.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2009273811 (OMATA HARUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0138]; figures 1-11 * [A] 15 [Y] 10-14; | [XP]EP3435167 (OKI DATA KK [JP]) [XP] 1-10,14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0263]; figures 1-17; tables 2-5 *; | [Y]EP3367171 (OKI DATA KK [JP]) [Y] 10-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9] , [0 36] , [0 37] *; | [A]JPH1178266 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005072956 (DAICEL CHEM [JP], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]JPH10166746 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 8 * paragraph [0030] * | by applicant | JP2018141869 |