EP3629152 - USING INDIVIDUALIZED APIS TO BLOCK AUTOMATED ATTACKS ON NATIVE APPS AND/OR PURPOSELY EXPOSED APIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shape Security, Inc. PO Box 772 Palo Alto, California 94302 / US | [2020/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Marc c/o Shape Security, Inc. PO Box 772 Palo Alto, California 94302 / US | [2020/14] | Representative(s) | Harden, Henry Simon, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/14] | Application number, filing date | 19210099.8 | 09.07.2015 | [2020/14] | Priority number, date | US201414327461 | 09.07.2014 Original published format: US201414327461 | US201514691540 | 20.04.2015 Original published format: US201514691540 | [2020/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629152 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3629152 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W12/084, H04W12/086, H04W12/122, H04W12/126 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP,US);
G06F21/55 (EP);
H04L63/0245 (US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
H04W12/086 (EP,US);
H04W12/122 (EP,US);
H04W12/126 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/14] | G06F9/00, G06F17/00, H04L29/06, H04W12/08, H04W12/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] |
Former [2020/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON INDIVIDUALISIERTEM APIS, UM AUTOMATISIERTE ANGRIFFE AUF NATIVE APPS UND / ODER AUSGESETZTE APPS ZU BLOCKIEREN | [2020/14] | English: | USING INDIVIDUALIZED APIS TO BLOCK AUTOMATED ATTACKS ON NATIVE APPS AND/OR PURPOSELY EXPOSED APIS | [2020/14] | French: | UTILISATION D'APIS INDIVIDUALISÉS POUR BLOQUER DES ATTAQUES AUTOMATISÉES SUR DES APPLICATIONS NATIVES ET / OU DES APIS EXPOSÉS | [2020/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 24.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15819670.9 / EP3167359 | Divisional application(s) | EP23200681.7 / EP4277320 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | IT | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | NL | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
NL | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004111485 (MIMATSU YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-19 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0096] ** claims 1-14 *; | [A]US2008244078 (VILJOEN PIETER [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0028] * * claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2012131354 (FRENCH GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0188] * * paragraphs [0206] - [0416] * * claims 1-28 *; | [X]US2013347094 (BETTINI ANTHONY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3, 8-9, 12-13 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0051] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0118] - [0127] * * paragraphs [0133] - [0142] * |