EP3824997 - A VIBRATING PRILLING BUCKET PARTICULARLY FOR PRILLING OF UREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASALE SA Via Giulio Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIZZI, Enrico Via Manzoni 4 22070 Casnate con Bernate (CO) / IT | 02 /
MONTINI, Fabiano Via Garavai 6 6807 Taverne / CH | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19210163.2 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824997 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/02, B01J2/18, C05C9/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
B01J2/02 (EP,US);
B01J2/12 (CN,US);
B01J2/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRIERENDER SPRÜHKONDENSATIONSKÜBEL INSBESONDERE ZUR SPRÜHKONDENSATION VON HARNSTOFF | [2021/21] | English: | A VIBRATING PRILLING BUCKET PARTICULARLY FOR PRILLING OF UREA | [2021/21] | French: | GODET DE GRELONAGE VIBRANT, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE GRELONAGE D'URÉE | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0233384 (STAMICARBON [NL]); | [A]WO2018164652 (DEINEKA OLEKSANDR VOLODYMYROVYCH [UA], et al); | by applicant | EP1624957 | EP2008709 |