EP3670834 - TURBINE BLADE WITH INTERNAL COOLING CHANNELS AND GAS FLOW SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mottram, Martin c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19210229.1 | 20.11.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | GB20180020669 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: GB 201820669 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670834 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, B01D45/12, B04C3/00, F01D5/18 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP);
F01D5/18 (US);
F01D5/081 (EP);
B01D45/04 (EP);
F05D2240/30 (US);
F05D2240/81 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2020/28] | English: | TURBINE BLADE WITH INTERNAL COOLING CHANNELS AND GAS FLOW SEPARATOR | [2020/26] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/26] | TURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT INTERNEN KÜHLKANÄLEN UND GASSTROMABSCHEIDER | ||
Former [2020/26] | AUBE DE TURBINE AVEC CANAUX DE REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNES ET SÉPARATEUR À COURANT DE GAZ | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2018202296 (KIENER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10-15,19 * paragraphs [0050] - [0061]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-9,16-18; | [XY]US2011067409 (BEECK ALEXANDER R [US]) [X] 1,2,10-16,19 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033]; figures 3,4,5 * [Y] 3,4,8,9; | [I]EP0340149 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1,2,10-19 * column 4; figures 2-7 *; | [I]EP2949880 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1-14,16,18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1882817 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,14,15,18,19 * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] - [0 58] - [0062]; figures 2-11 *; | [Y]EP3163051 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6-14,19 * figures 2-9 *; | [Y]US6308511 (BEECK ALEXANDER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14,16-19 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US3989412 (MUKHERJEE DILIP) [Y] 1,10-12,16-19 * figures 1-3 * |