EP3656607 - DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING A COMFORT ELEMENT IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpeedInnov 9 rue Boissy d'Anglas 75008 Paris / FR | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ-GOMEZ, Maria-Isabel 3, Boulevard Biron 93400 Saint Ouen / FR | 02 /
BOULAY, Adrien 3, Boulevard Biron 93400 Saint Ouen / FR | 03 /
HUART, Johan 25, résidence les vergers du château 59990 Preseau / FR | 04 /
NOE, Ludovic 29, rue Gabriel Péri 59700 Marcq en Baroeul / FR | [2024/22] |
Former [2020/22] | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ-GOMEZ, Maria-Isabel 3, Boulevard BIRON 93400 SAINT OUEN / FR | ||
02 /
BOULAY, Adrien 3, Boulevard BIRON 93400 SAINT OUEN / FR | |||
03 /
HUART, Johan 25, résidence les vergers du château 59990 PRESEAU / FR | |||
04 /
NOE, Ludovic 29, rue Gabriel Péri 59700 MARCQ EN BAROEUL / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/22] | Application number, filing date | 19210791.0 | 21.11.2019 | [2020/22] | Priority number, date | FR20180071693 | 22.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1871693 | [2020/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656607 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3656607 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/24, B61D33/00, B61D17/18, B61D17/08, B60R13/02 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
B60N2/242 (EP);
B60N2/015 (EP);
B60N2/0264 (EP);
B60R13/0237 (EP);
B61D17/08 (EP);
B61D17/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2020/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALTERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KOMFORTELEMENT IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2020/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING A COMFORT ELEMENT IN A VEHICLE | [2020/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE CONFORT DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2020/22] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 19.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0754621 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 6, line 14 - column 7, line 8; figures 6,7,8 * [I] 4,6; | [A]EP2033869 (ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0061] - [0064]; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2979316 (M Y G [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 17 - page 13, line 20; figures 1-3 * |