EP3659412 - A CULTIVATOR AND A METHOD FOR CONNECTING A GROUND TOOL TO A TOOL CARRYING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thyregod A/S Borgergade 46 Thyregod 7323 Give / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Thyregod A/S Borgerfade 46 Thyregod 7323 Give / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Claus Harrild Risbjerg Vej 54, Drantum 7330 Brande / DK | 02 /
POULSEN, Rune Heliosvænget 26 lejl. 59 5250 Odense SV / DK | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2020/23] | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 19210922.1 | 22.11.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | DK2018PA70782 | 27.11.2018 Original published format: DK PA201870782 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3659412 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/06, A01B23/02, A01B35/22, // A01B33/02, A01B33/04, A01B33/08, A01B35/24 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
A01B15/06 (EP);
A01B35/32 (DK);
A01B23/02 (EP);
A01B35/225 (EP);
A01B33/025 (EP);
A01B33/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KULTIVATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES BODENWERKZEUGS MIT EINER WERKZEUGTRAGESTRUKTUR | [2020/28] | English: | A CULTIVATOR AND A METHOD FOR CONNECTING A GROUND TOOL TO A TOOL CARRYING STRUCTURE | [2020/23] | French: | CULTIVATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCOUPLEMENT D'UN OUTIL DE SOL À UNE STRUCTURE PORTE-OUTIL | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/23] | GRUBBER UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN EINES BODENWERKZEUGS MIT EINER WERKZEUGTRAGESTRUKTUR | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/21] | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3222128 (DICK BERNHARD [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure 1 * [I] 3,6,7,9; | [X]EP3155885 (DICK BERNHARD [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4399874 (RYAN JOHN W [AU]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]CA2820455 (SALFORD FARM MACHINERY LTD [CA]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1259105 | DK200301200L |