EP3632965 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROPHYLACTIC ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latexx Manufacturing SDN. BHD. Lot 18374, Jalan Perusahaan 3 Kamunting Industrial Estate Perak 34600 Kamunting / MY | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Semperit Aktiengesellschaft Holding Modecenterstrasse 22 1031 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZNER, Armin Semperitstraße 3/2 2630 Ternitz / AT | 02 /
KERN, Wolfgang Feldkirchnerstraße 161 8055 Seiersberg / AT | 03 /
MANHART, Jakob Cornelius Eichbergstrasse 11A 2372 Giesshübl / AT | 04 /
SAHIN, Melahat Langgasse 18/3 8700 Leoben / AT | 05 /
SCHALLER, Raimund Ramplacher Straße 24 2620 Neunkirchen / AT | 06 /
SCHLÖGL, Sandra Södingberg 195 8152 Stallhofen / AT | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 19210944.5 | 02.03.2017 | [2020/15] | Priority number, date | AT20160050176 | 04.03.2016 Original published format: AT 501762016 | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632965 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/02, C08J3/26, B29C41/14, A61B42/10 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
C08J3/26 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (AT);
C08C19/25 (US);
A61B42/10 (EP,AT);
B29C35/0805 (US);
B29C41/003 (US);
B29C41/14 (US);
B29C41/46 (US);
C08J5/02 (EP,US);
C08L13/02 (US);
B29K2083/00 (US);
B29L2031/4864 (US);
C08J2307/02 (EP,US);
C08J2309/04 (EP,US);
C08J2309/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2020/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES PROPHYLAXEARTIKELS | [2020/15] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PROPHYLACTIC ITEM | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE DE TRAITEMENT PROPHYLACTIQUE | [2020/15] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 18.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/25] | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17717060.2 / EP3423515 | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 25.03.2021 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0011980 (GARDON JOHN L [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, paragraph 2; claims 1,3,17 * * page 15, paragraph l - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 23 - page 25 * [I] 4-8; | [XI]EP1209186 (SUZUKI LATEX INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0072] - [0075] - [144 (pH)] , [ 195]; examples 25,27; claims 1-10,15; table 5 * [I] 4,6; | [X]EP1762586 (SEMPERIT AG HOLDING [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] - [0029] , [0038] , [0053]; example -; claims 1-10,37-41 * * paragraph [20 (multifunktionelleThiole)] *; | [A]WO2010105283 (SEMPERIT AG HOLDING [AT], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 23, line 4 - page 24, line l; claims 11,15,31 *; | [AD]EP2719720 (SEMPERIT AG HOLDING [AT]) [AD] 1-8 * paragraph [0026]; claim 12 *; | [A] - DIETMAR LENKO ET AL, "Dual crosslinking of carboxylated nitrile butadiene rubber latex employing the thiol-ene photoreaction", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, US, (20130905), vol. 129, no. 5, doi:10.1002/app.38983, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 2735 - 2743, XP055387216 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.38983 | [A] - SANDRA SCHLÖGL ET AL, "Photo-vulcanization using thiol-ene chemistry: Film formation, morphology and network characteristics of UV crosslinked rubber latices", POLYMER., GB, (20140610), vol. 55, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.polymer.2014.06.007, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 5584 - 5595, XP055387227 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2014.06.007 | [I] - BROWN H P ET AL, "CROSSLINKING REACTIONS OF CARBOXYLIC ELASTOMERS", RUBBER CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, RUBBER DIVISION, US, (19630904), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0035-9475, pages 931 - 962, XP001109664 [I] 1-8 * page 953 - page 957; figure 13; table 6 * * Summary; page 961 * | by applicant | US2010152365 | WO2011068394 | US2014096307 | US2014096308 | - Macromolecules, (20080000), vol. 41, pages 4717 - 4729 | - J. Appl. Polym. Sci., vol. 129, no. 5, pages 2735 - 2743 | - ZABORSKI, M.KOSMALSKA, A.GULINSKI, J. KAUTSCH, Gummi Kunstst., (20050000), vol. 58, page 354 |