EP3673736 - OTIC COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFECTIONS OF THE INTERNAL AND EXTERNAL EAR IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2020/50] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Foresight Biotherapeutics, Inc. 50 W. 57th Street, 15th Floor New York, NY 10019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPRIOTTI, Joseph, A. 1 Morningside Drive Apt. 917 New York, NY New York 10025 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Bo Bromley Place East Brunswick, NJ New Jersey 08816 / US | 03 /
SAMSON, C., Michael 630 1st Ave. 25K New York, NY New York 10016 / US | 04 /
STEIN, Jason 1345 Avenue of the Americas 42nd Floor New York, NY 10105 / US | 05 /
WEISER, Michael 1345 Avenue of the Americas 42nd Floor New York, NY 10105 / US | [2020/38] |
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
CAPRIOTTI, Joseph, A. 1 Morningside Drive Apt. 917 New York, NY New York 10025 / US | ||
02 /
LIANG, Bo Bromley Place East Brunswick, NJ New Jersey 08816 / US | |||
03 /
SAMSON, C., Michael 630 1st Ave. 25K New York, NY New York 10016 / US | |||
04 /
STEIN, Jason 500 E. 77th Street Apt. 1035 New York, NY New York 10162 / US | |||
05 /
WEISER, Michael 55 Thompson Street, Apt.5D New York, NY New York 10012 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19211027.8 | 24.02.2010 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | US20090380463 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 380463 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673736 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/36, A61K31/40, A61P29/00, A61P27/00, // A61K9/06, A61K31/79, A61K9/00, A61K31/573 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/79 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0031 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0046 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US);
A61K31/79, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 07.01.2021 | BA | 07.01.2021 | RS | 07.01.2021 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DAS OHR ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN DES INNEN- UND AUSSENOHRS BEI SÄUGERN | [2020/27] | English: | OTIC COMPOSITIONS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF INFECTIONS OF THE INTERNAL AND EXTERNAL EAR IN MAMMALS | [2020/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS OTIQUES UTILISABLES DANS LE CADRE DU TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS DE L'OREILLE INTERNE ET DE L'OREILLE EXTERNE CHEZ LES MAMMIFÈRES | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 07.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/25] | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10746775.5 / EP2400842 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006057226 (JOHNSON JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1-15* page 1, paragraphs 7-13 *; | [Y]US2006280809 (LESHCHINER ADELE K [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 3; example 7 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2007106381 (CLS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 8, 9, 24 * * pages 2-3 *; | [Y]US2008172032 (GILLS JAMES PITZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 10 * * page 2, paragraphs 15-16 *; | [XY]WO2008137658 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * claims 1, 7, 8, 9 * * page 3, lines 1-24 * * page 9; example 1 * [Y] 8,9 | by applicant | US2007219170 | - RACKUR H. J., Hosp. Infect., (19850000), vol. 6, pages 13 - 23 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 25301-02-4 | US20090636293 |