EP3666178 - MONITORING SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER DEVICE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION WITH AT LEAST ONE SLAVE DEVICE HAVING A SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | [2024/43] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states WIDEX A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Soren Mollskov Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | 02 /
Kroman, Morten Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 3540 Lynge / DK | [2024/42] |
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
Larsen, Soren Mollskov Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | ||
02 /
Kroman, Morten Widex A/S Nymøllevej 6 DK-3540 Lynge / DK | Application number, filing date | 19211147.4 | 25.11.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201862779574P | 14.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862779574 P | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666178 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666178 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/021, A61B5/024 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/0024 (EP,US);
A61B5/291 (US);
A61B5/0082 (US);
A61B5/02108 (EP);
A61B5/02416 (EP);
A61B5/02427 (US);
A61B5/6803 (US);
A61B5/6815 (EP);
A61B5/6817 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER MASTER-VORRICHTUNG IN DER DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATION MIT MINDESTENS EINER SLAVE-VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SENSOR | [2020/25] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER DEVICE IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION WITH AT LEAST ONE SLAVE DEVICE HAVING A SENSOR | [2020/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF MAÎTRE DANS UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL AVEC AU MOINS UN DISPOSITIF ESCLAVE DOTÉ D'UN CAPTEUR | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 17.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 07.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 07.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 07.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016255600 (HAYAMI ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2018134380 (BYTEFLIES N V [BE]); | [X]US2018353086 (TURNER JAKE BERRY [DE], et al) |