EP3667479 - DISPLAY INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKI, Kosuke KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. C/O KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Robert-Koch-Str. 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19211187.0 | 25.11.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | JP20180234611 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018234611 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667479 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0488 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/04817 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0483 (US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,CN);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN);
G06F3/04886 (US);
H04M1/72472 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEEINGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/25] | English: | DISPLAY INPUT DEVICE | [2020/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012166987 (KANG TAE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0125]; figures 1-16 *; | [A]US2013007666 (SONG WEI [CN], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015058763 (LEONARD CHANTAL M [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1-13 *; | [I]EP2988197 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 46] - paragraph [0227]; figures 1-2F *; | [I]US2016170600 (HORIIKE YOSHITERU [JP]) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0088]; figures 2A-9 * |