Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3828113
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
22.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.01.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.11.2022 |
First examination report |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
22.09.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.04.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
29.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
26.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|