EP3667283 - ICE CRYSTAL ICING CONDITION SIMULATION METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIS, Charles Steven The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
LANGHOFER, Erik M. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 03 /
HASS, David Charles The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | 04 /
DARR, Rachel M. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19211593.9 | 26.11.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201816215366 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: US201816215366 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667283 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3667283 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01M9/04, F25C1/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G01M9/04 (EP,US);
B64F5/60 (CN);
F25C1/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SIMULATION VON EISKRISTALLVEREISUNGSBEDINGUNGEN | [2020/25] | English: | ICE CRYSTAL ICING CONDITION SIMULATION METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SIMULATION D'ÉTAT DE GIVRAGE DE CRISTAUX DE GLACE | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 24.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | IT | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | LU | 26.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
LU | 26.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
IT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2241537 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]CN201041445Y (UNIV BEI HANG [CN]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2650665 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]CN104634536 (UNIV TIANJIN) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102914416B (UNIV TONGJI) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - LENG MENGYAO ET AL, "Simulation of air-droplet mixed phase flow in icing wind-tunnel", AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, NEW YORK, US, (20130101), doi:10.1063/1.4816920, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 659 - 670, XP055687548 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4816920 |