EP3689767 - QUICK-ASSEMBLY CONTAINING BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chou, Chi-Ming 7F., No. 6-1, Ronghua 3rd Rd. Beitou Dist. Taipei City / TW | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Werner-Eckert-Str. 4 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Herrnstrasse 44 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19211857.8 | 27.11.2019 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | TW20190103518 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: TW 108103518 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689767 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/32, B65D5/24, B65D5/28 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
B65D5/241 (EP);
B65D5/242 (CN);
B65D5/3635 (US);
B65D5/2057 (US);
B65D5/24 (US);
B65D5/28 (EP);
B65D5/3664 (US);
B65D5/42 (CN);
B65D5/4266 (CN,US);
B65D5/443 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASTEN MIT SCHNELLMONTAGE | [2020/32] | English: | QUICK-ASSEMBLY CONTAINING BOX | [2020/32] | French: | BOÎTIER-CONTENANT À ASSEMBLAGE RAPIDE | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 31.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3137434 (BERG ROBERT A) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XI]US3545665 (NIMAROFF ALEXANDER) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 * [I] 4; | [XI]US3987957 (JOHNSON FRED J) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 11; figures 1-6; claims 1-4 * [I] 4; | [XYI]US5855317 (DALRYMPLE BRUCE H [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-10; claims 1-21 * [Y] 6 [I] 3,5; | [A]WO2013153383 (BOX MART LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6* page 5, line 10 - page 9, line 11; figures 1-10; claims 1-33 *; | [A]DE202017004571U (CHOU CHI-MING [TW]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-12; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]TWM555842U (ZHUO QI MING [TW]) [Y] 6 * figure 4 * | by applicant | TW20190103518 |