EP3639875 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MECHANICAL LUNG VENTILATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vyaire Medical Capital LLC 26125 N. Riverwoods Blvd Mettawa, IL 60045 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONASSA, Jorge R. Heron Domingues 150 04640-070 Sao Paulo - SP / BR | 02 /
DE LIMA SANTOS, Adriano R. Pedroso Xavier 277 Ap. 161, Tower 2 02732-020 Sao Paulo - SP / BR | 03 /
CALVO LONARDONI, José Augusto Al. das Figueiras 419 Cond. V., Verde 06670-140 Itapevi - SP / BR | 04 /
COUTINHO MELCO, Tito R. Tarcisio Maria da Costa 85 03173-030 Sao Paulo - SP / BR | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 19211869.3 | 19.03.2015 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201414251494 | 11.04.2014 Original published format: US201414251494 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3639875 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, // A61M16/20 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
A61M16/205 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/00 (BR,CN);
A61M16/0051 (CN);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/204 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ENTLÜFTUNG EINER MECHANISCHEN LUNGE | [2020/17] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MECHANICAL LUNG VENTILATION | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA VENTILATION PULMONAIRE MÉCANIQUE | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15717303.0 / EP3129091 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006011195 (ZARYCHTA JAROSLAW [CA]); | [A]US2008295840 (GLAW TOBIAS [DE]); | [A]US2008295839 (HABASHI NADER M [US]); | [A]US2011232644 (DOYLE PETER RAYMOND [US]) |