EP3666696 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE LAYERED HANDLING OF STACKED PIECE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING LAYERS OF PIECE GOODS ARRANGED ONE ABOVE THE OTHER | ||
[2020/28] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOEHL, Bernd Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
LINNER, Johann Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
PERL, Kurt Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 04 /
KINDERMANN, Dieter Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19211878.4 | 27.11.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | DE201810132242 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018132242 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666696 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65G59/00, B65G59/02 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B65G59/005 (EP);
B65G59/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHICHTWEISEN HANDHABUNG VON ÜBEREINANDER ANGEORDNETEN STÜCKGUTLAGEN | [2020/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE LAYERED HANDLING OF STACKED PIECE GOODS | [2020/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION COUCHE PAR COUCHE DES COUCHES DE PIÈCES DISPOSÉES LES UNES SUR LES AUTRES | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/25] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING LAYERS OF PIECE GOODS ARRANGED ONE ABOVE THE OTHER | ||
Former [2020/25] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR MANIPULER DES COUCHES DE MARCHANDISES UNITAIRES SUPERPOSEES | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 17.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5256028 (WINSKI ERNEST P [US], et al); | [Y]JPH08225154 (SS PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [XY]DE19515998 (PROFINISH SA [CH]); | [YA]CN203095170U (GUANGZHOU VANTA PACKAGING MACHINERY CO LTD); | [Y]EP3025988 (GEBO PACKAGING SOLUTIONS ITALY SRL [IT]) | by applicant | JPS597884B | DE2635638 | CN203095165U | CN103612918 | CN203602055U | DE202013103400U |