EP3654487 - FAST CHARGING METHOD AND SYSTEM, TERMINAL, AND CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xujun Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 02 /
LIU, Ce Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yanding Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 04 /
MA, Jinbo Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 05 /
WANG, Pinghua Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/21] | 01 /
LIU, Xujun Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | ||
02 /
LIU, Ce Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | |||
03 /
LIU, Yanding Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | |||
04 /
MA, Jinbo Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | |||
05 /
WANG, Pinghua Huawei Technologies Co.,Ltd. Intellectual Property Department F1-5F, Bantian, Longgang District shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/18] |
Former [2020/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19211984.0 | 24.03.2017 | [2020/21] | Priority number, date | CN201610218184 | 08.04.2016 Original published format: CN201610218184 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3654487 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3654487 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2020/21] | CPC: |
H02J7/007184 (EP,US);
H02J7/00712 (KR,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
G01R31/3648 (US);
H01M10/44 (KR);
H02J7/00302 (KR);
H02J7/0031 (KR);
H02J7/0042 (US);
H02J7/0047 (KR);
H01M10/4257 (US);
H02J2207/20 (KR);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] |
Former [2020/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNELLLADEVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM, ENDGERÄT UND LADEGERÄT | [2020/21] | English: | FAST CHARGING METHOD AND SYSTEM, TERMINAL, AND CHARGER | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGEMENT RAPIDE, TERMINAL ET CHARGEUR | [2020/21] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 02.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17778601.9 / EP3435511 | Divisional application(s) | EP23157715.6 / EP4207552 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009174366 (AHMAD BAHER A [US], et al); | [A]US2014300321 (KIM CHULKWI [KR], et al); | [XA]WO2015113349 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM [CN]); | [A]WO2015113333 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMM [CN]); | [A]EP2942853 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]); | [P]EP3101758 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]); | [P]EP3101752 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]) |