EP3650467 - METHOD AND KIT FOR DETECTING 1,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D AND RELATED ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DiaSorin S.p.A. Via Crescentino snc 13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | [2020/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLDO, Joshua 13899 Kensington Ave NE Prior Lake, MN 55372 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Gregory 16370 Division St. Lakeland, MN 55043 / US | 03 /
* * * | 04 /
WALL, John 682 Falcon Ridge Rd. Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | 05 /
NEW, Michael 10918 Little Ave S Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | 06 /
DELUCA, Hector Floyd 1809 County Highway BB Deerfield, WI 53531 / US | 07 /
BONELLI, Fabrizio Via Musso 2 I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | [2020/20] | Representative(s) | Rimini, Rebecca, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 19212047.5 | 27.01.2014 | [2020/20] | Priority number, date | EP20130152851 | 28.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13152851 | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3650467 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/26, G01N33/82, // C07K16/28 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
C07K16/2869 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (EP,US);
G01N33/82 (EP,US);
C07K2317/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] |
Former [2020/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR DETEKTION VON 1,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN ANTIKÖRPERN | [2020/20] | English: | METHOD AND KIT FOR DETECTING 1,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMIN D AND RELATED ANTIBODIES | [2020/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET KIT DE DÉTECTION DE 1,25-DIHYDROXYVITAMINE D ET ANTICORPS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/20] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 09.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/46] | 13.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14702498.8 / EP2948474 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8901631 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-21 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0583945 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008092917 (IMMUNDIAGNOSTIK AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [X] - SWAMI S ET AL, "A new enzyme-linked immunosorbant assay for the measurement of human vitamin D receptor", BONE (NEW YORK), (200103), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 8756-3282, pages 319 - 326, XP002694951 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 320, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 325 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S8756-3282(00)00432-4 | [X] - VAISANEN SAMI ET AL, "Conformational studies of human vitamin-D receptor by antipeptide antibodies, partial proteolytic digestion and ligand binding", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 248, no. 1, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 156 - 162, XP002720791 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 161, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.t01-1-00156.x | [X] - YONGJI WANG ET AL, "Where is the vitamin D receptor?", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, vol. 523mouse monoclonal antibody against the C-terminu, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ABB.2012.04.001, ISSN 0003-9861, (20120406), pages 123 - 133, (20120406), XP028509235 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.abb.2012.04.001 | [X] - A Staal ET AL, "Distinct Conformations of Vitamin D Receptor/Retinoid X Receptotw Heterodimers Are Specified by Dinucleotide Differences in the Vitamin D-Responsive Elements of the Osteocalcin and Osteopontin Genes*", Molecular Endocrinology, (19960101), URL: https://oup.silverchair-cdn.com/oup/backfile/Content_public/Journal/mend/10/11/10.1210_mend.10.11.8923469/3/mend1444.pdf?Expires=1501156293&Signature=L7LOP8pQF~mPcA1g8W2uK-~vuQ8BMlBSR~kjjRBjeeANpDFIIiuF18ucQBUTgcREMxv5NJ8vSlDZSH6wooAJt5U-zY0N2HTCMErmrgrkS-rRARe4-8cySwbO2rdM7xxqaoDo-ESiMQ5qVIfH7g~x41, (20170726), XP055393933 [X] 1-8 * page 1454 * | by applicant | WO8901631 | EP0583945 | - MANGELSDORF DJ et al., Cell, (19950000), vol. 83, no. 6, pages 835 - 9 | - HAUSSLER MR et al., J Bone Miner Res., (19980000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 325 - 49 | - ROCHEL NWURTZ JMMITSCHLER AKLAHOLZ BMORAS D, "The crystal structure of the nuclear receptor for vitamin D bound to its natural ligand", Mol Cell, (20000000), vol. 5, doi:10.1016/S1097-2765(00)80413-X, pages 173 - 179, XP000929728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)80413-X | - GLENVILLE J. et al., Physiological Reviews, (19980000), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 1193 - 1231 | - KIRAN K. SINGARAPU et al., Biochemistry, (20110000), vol. 50, no. 51, pages 11015 - 24 | - HOLICK MF, N Engl J Med., (20070000), vol. 357, no. 3, pages 266 - 81 | - HOLICK MFCHEN TC., Am J Clin Nutr., (20080000), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 1080S - 6S | - S. SWAMI et al., Bone, (20010000), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 319 - 326 | - COSTAGLIOLA et al., J Immunol, (19980000), vol. 160, pages 1458 - 65 |