EP3660599 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SETTING VALUE FOR CONTROLLING A CONTROLLABLE DEVICE OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Holdings 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen-sur-Seine / FR | [2023/41] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABOU-EID, Rami 60 rue Joseph de Maistre 75018 Paris / FR | 02 /
CHEVALIER, Philippe 84 rue Jules Parent 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 03 /
CHAN, Josselin 20 rue de la Gare 92320 Chatillon / FR | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/23] | Application number, filing date | 19212169.7 | 28.11.2019 | [2020/23] | Priority number, date | FR20180072047 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1872047 | [2020/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3660599 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3660599 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
G05B15/02 (EP);
G05B2219/2614 (EP);
G05B2219/2642 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] |
Former [2020/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES SOLLWERTS FÜR DAS STEUERN EINER STEUERBAREN AUSRÜSTUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2024/02] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SETTING VALUE FOR CONTROLLING A CONTROLLABLE DEVICE OF A VEHICLE | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UNE VALEUR DE CONSIGNE POUR LE PILOTAGE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT COMMANDABLE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/23] | BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN EINES SOLLWERTS FÜR DAS STEUERN EINER VON EINEM FAHRZEUG AUS STEUERBAREN AUSRÜSTUNG | Examination procedure | 20.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 20.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2653945 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC BUILDINGS [US]); | [A]WO2014043313 (SIEMENS CORP [US], et al); | [XI]US2016056629 (BAKER RHODES B [US], et al) |