EP3795853 - RAIL WHEEL COMPRISING A BRAKE DISC WITH A SEGMENTED FRICTION RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Witten GmbH Brauckstrasse 26 58454 Witten / DE | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montua, Sebastian Faiveley Transport Witten GmbH Brauckstraße 26 58454 Witten / DE | 02 /
Radtke, Norbert Faiveley Transport Witten GmbH Brauckstraße 26 58454 Witten / DE | 03 /
Schulte-Farwig, Lasse Faiveley Transport GmbH Brauckstraße 26 58454 Witten / DE | 04 /
Beckmann, Wolfgang Faiveley Transport Witten GmbH Brauckstraße 26 58454 Witten / DE | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19212274.5 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | EP20190198434 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19198434 | [2021/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795853 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3795853 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/12 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
F16D65/121 (EP,CN);
F16D65/122 (CN);
B60B17/00 (CN);
F16D65/124 (EP);
F16D2065/1312 (EP,CN);
F16D2065/1324 (CN);
F16D2065/1336 (CN);
F16D2065/1356 (EP);
F16D2065/138 (CN);
F16D2065/1392 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | SCHIENENRAD UMFASSEND EINE BREMSSCHEIBE MIT EINEM SEGMENTIERTEN REIBRING | [2021/12] | English: | RAIL WHEEL COMPRISING A BRAKE DISC WITH A SEGMENTED FRICTION RING | [2021/12] | French: | ROUE FERROVIAIRE COMPRENANT UN DISQUE DE FREIN DOTÉ D'UNE BAGUE DE FRICTION SEGMENTÉE | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 23.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2019 | AL | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | LU | 28.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 28.11.2019 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | EE | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 12.05.2021 | |
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB1348976 (GIRLING LTD) [Y] 13 * page 1, line 69 - line 75; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]DE2819832 (GIRLING LTD) [A] 1-15 * page 10, paragraph l - page 11, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [XA]US5788026 (POLI ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 25; figure - * [A] 13; | [A]EP2702293 (SAFE METAL [FR], et al) [A] 1,13* figures 1-3; claims 5,6 *; | [XY]US2016076613 (BOFFELLI ROBERTO [IT]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * paragraph [0034]; figure - * [Y] 13 | by applicant | DE2133235 | EP0616143 | WO2010108671 |