Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3657317 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3657317



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 311
08.02.2023 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.10.2022 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.10.2022 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 13
20.10.2022 Means of redress Search / examination 2
19.10.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.10.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.2022 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.10.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 11
04.10.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex Search / examination 1
28.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.09.2022 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
26.09.2022 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
29.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
29.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
29.07.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
29.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.07.2022 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
29.10.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
29.10.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings and communication from Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.10.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.11.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.11.2020 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.11.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
02.11.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.11.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.06.2020 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
30.04.2020 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.04.2020 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.04.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
21.02.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.02.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 5
21.02.2020 European search report Search / examination 4
21.02.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
28.11.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.11.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.11.2019 Claims Search / examination 4
28.11.2019 Description Search / examination 34
28.11.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
28.11.2019 Drawings Search / examination 8
28.11.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58
07.05.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 70