EP3736955 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROL OF TUNABLE PASSIVE COMPONENT BASED POWER FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2020/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Ben 46 Lawler Road West Hartford, CT 06117 / US | 02 /
DWARI, Suman 75 Hockanum Boulevard Apartment No. 1137 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/46] | Application number, filing date | 19212436.0 | 29.11.2019 | [2020/46] | Priority number, date | US201916403944 | 06.05.2019 Original published format: US201916403944 | [2020/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3736955 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/14, H02M3/158, // H02J1/02, H03H7/01, H03H7/12 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
H02M3/158 (EP,US);
H02M1/14 (EP,US);
H03J1/0008 (US);
H02J1/02 (EP);
H02J2310/44 (EP);
H03H7/0115 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] |
Former [2020/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON ABSTIMMBAREN LEISTUNGSFILTERN AUF BASIS PASSIVER KOMPONENTEN | [2020/46] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROL OF TUNABLE PASSIVE COMPONENT BASED POWER FILTERS | [2020/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE FILTRES DE PUISSANCE À BASE DE COMPOSANT PASSIF RÉGLABLE | [2020/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/24] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/21] | 24.04.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013320943 (MEEHAN PATRICK J [IE], et al) [I] 1,8,15 * figures 2b, 2d * * paragraph [0024] *; | [I]US2016248319 (MEEHAN PATRICK J [IE], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0095] *; | [A] - PHINNEY J ET AL, "Filters with active tuning for power applications", 32ND.ANNUAL IEEE POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. PESC 2001. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. VANCOUVER, CANADA, JUNE 17 - 21, 2001; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010617), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/PESC.2001.954047, ISBN 978-0-7803-7067-8, pages 363 - 370, XP010559175 [A] 1-15 * figures 2a, 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.2001.954047 |