Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11955818 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2024 | B2 | US2022368171 | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 | WO2020EP83503 | 26.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102584271B | Global Dossier | 04.10.2023 | B1 | KR20210096097 | 04.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 | WO2020EP83503 | 26.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7234367B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2023 | B2 | JP2022515975 | 24.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 | WO2020EP83503 | 26.11.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113196716B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2022 | B | CN113196716 | 30.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 | WO2020EP83503 | 26.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021105282 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3829028 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | C0 | EP3829028 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | B1 | EP3829028 | 02.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19212476 | 29.11.2019 |