EP3829028 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR PROVIDING OPERATIONAL FEEDBACK DURING POWER TRANSFER IN A WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 09.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states ElectDis AB c/o Adimo AB Västergatan 22 211 21 Malmö / SE | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swaans, Laurens Nicoloviusgatan 10A 217 57 Malmö / SE | 02 /
Lau, Buon Kiong Fjelievägen 38 227 36 Lund / SE | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 19212476.6 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/22] | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 09.08.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/37] | 16.08.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/37] | 16.08.2023 | Date of registration [2023/37] | 12.07.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/37] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 16.08.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/37] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3829028 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 05 |