EP3823236 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING CUSTOM CODE IN A DATA COMPUTING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 1200 17th Street, Floor 15 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2022/48] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Palantir Technologies Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, James c/o Palantir Technologies, Inc. 100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA California 94301 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Sayer, Robert David, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19212961.7 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | US201962934737P | 13.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962934737 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823236 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3823236 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, H04L9/40 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
G06F21/604 (EP);
H04L63/0281 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG EINES BENUTZERSPEZIFISCHEN CODES IN EINER DATENVERARBEITUNGSPLATTFORM | [2021/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING CUSTOM CODE IN A DATA COMPUTING PLATFORM | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GESTION DE CODE PERSONNALISÉ DANS UNE PLATEFORME INFORMATIQUE | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 19.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24153529.3 / EP4362395 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2378455 (LAYER 7 TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]); | [A]US2017126686 (TOTOV TODOR YOTKOV [BG]); | [A]US2018020002 (DUCA FREDERICK J [US], et al) |