EP3663809 - TRANSPARENT MEMBER AND IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TRANSPARENT MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2024 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2025 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 28.05.2025 [2025/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Yo CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Tomonari CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Junji CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
TAKACHI, Miwa CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 19213486.4 | 04.12.2019 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | JP20180230318 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018230318 | JP20190199987 | 01.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019199987 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663809 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3663809 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10, C08J7/02, C08J7/054 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
C08J7/054 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (CN,US);
H04N23/54 (US);
C08J7/02 (EP,US);
C08J7/06 (CN,US);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02B1/18 (EP,US);
G03B11/043 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTES ELEMENT UND BILDERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES TRANSPARENTEN ELEMENTS | [2020/24] | English: | TRANSPARENT MEMBER AND IMAGE PICKUP APPARATUS, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING TRANSPARENT MEMBER | [2020/24] | French: | ÉLÉMENT TRANSPARENT ET APPAREIL DE CAPTURE D'IMAGES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT TRANSPARENT | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 10.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23211421.5 / EP4328260 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2025/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | CZ | 07.02.2024 | DK | 07.02.2024 | EE | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | IT | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | RO | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | SI | 07.02.2024 | SK | 07.02.2024 | SM | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2025/22] |
Former [2025/02] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2024 | ||
DK | 07.02.2024 | ||
EE | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
IT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
RO | 07.02.2024 | ||
SE | 07.02.2024 | ||
SK | 07.02.2024 | ||
SM | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/49] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2024 | ||
DK | 07.02.2024 | ||
EE | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
RO | 07.02.2024 | ||
SE | 07.02.2024 | ||
SK | 07.02.2024 | ||
SM | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/48] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2024 | ||
DK | 07.02.2024 | ||
EE | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
SE | 07.02.2024 | ||
SM | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/47] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
DK | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
SE | 07.02.2024 | ||
SM | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/37] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
SE | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2013203774 (CENTRAL AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS LTD); | [A]US2017269264 (MAKINO KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP3373048 (CANON KK [JP]); | by applicant | JP2013203774 |