EP3704931 - TRAVELING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANJI, Yasuhiro c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku SAKAI-SHI, OSAKA, 5900823 / JP | [2020/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 19213641.4 | 04.12.2019 | [2020/37] | Priority number, date | JP20190040292 | 06.03.2019 Original published format: JP 2019040292 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3704931 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3704931 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D11/04, B62D11/00, A01D34/64, B60K7/00, B60L1/00, B60L15/02 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60W10/20 (US);
A01D34/006 (US);
A01D34/64 (EP);
B60K7/0007 (EP);
B60L15/02 (EP);
B62D11/003 (EP);
B62D11/04 (EP);
H02K7/006 (US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP);
B60L2200/40 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP);
B60W2300/156 (US);
B60W2520/403 (US);
B60W2520/406 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | A01D69/02, B60L15/32, B62D11/00, B62D11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Title | German: | FAHRENDES FAHRZEUG | [2020/37] | English: | TRAVELING VEHICLE | [2020/37] | French: | VÉHICULE DE DÉPLACEMENT | [2020/37] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 06.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2019 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | MT | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | IE | 04.12.2021 | LU | 04.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | DE | 01.07.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 04.12.2019 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
MK | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 04.12.2019 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
IE | 04.12.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
DE | 01.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
LU | 04.12.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004071800 (WAVECREST LAB LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 40, line 17 - page 41, line 24; figure - *; | [A]EP2327607 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012323420 (KOIKE KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016274588 (TANAKA SHOJI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0130] - [0135]; figure - *; | [A]US2017005599 (YAMADA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figure - *; | [A]US2017246957 (IENAGA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047]; figure - *; | [A]EP3220014 (MAX HOLDER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2017132406 |