EP3671836 - 3D CIRCUIT WITH A MESA ISOLATION FOR THE GROUND PLANE REGION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/26] | 3D CIRCUIT WITH A MESA ISOLATION FOR THE GROUND PLANE REGION | ||
[2020/28] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives 25 Rue Leblanc Bat Le Ponant 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATUDE, Perrine CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
ANDRIEU, François CEA GRENOBLE 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/24] |
Former [2020/26] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19213818.8 | 05.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | FR20180073965 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873965 | [2020/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671836 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3671836 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L27/06, H01L21/822, H01L21/8234 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H01L27/1207 (EP);
H01L21/8221 (EP,US);
H01L21/02126 (US);
H01L21/02164 (US);
H01L21/02667 (US);
H01L21/26513 (US);
H01L21/30604 (US);
H01L21/31111 (US);
H01L21/32053 (US);
H01L21/324 (US);
H01L21/76254 (US);
H01L21/76895 (US);
H01L21/823437 (EP);
H01L21/84 (US);
H01L21/0217 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | 3D SCHALTUNG MIT EINER MESA-ISOLATION FÜR DEN GRUNDPLATTENBEREICH | [2024/01] | English: | 3D CIRCUIT WITH A MESA ISOLATION FOR THE GROUND PLANE REGION | [2024/01] | French: | CIRCUIT 3D DOTE D'UNE ISOLATION MESA POUR LA ZONE DE PLAN DE MASSE | [2020/26] |
Former [2020/26] | 3D SCHALTUNG MIT EINEM MESA-ISOLATION FÜR DEN GRUNDPLATTENBEREICH | ||
Former [2020/26] | 3D CIRCUIT WITH A MESA ISOLATION FOR THE GROUND PLANE REGION | Examination procedure | 05.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 10.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011298021 (TADA MUNEHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2013193550 (SKLENARD BENOIT [FR], et al); | [XI]US9023688 (OR-BACH ZVI [US], et al) | by applicant | US9761593 |