EP3670837 - TURBINE SECTION OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE VANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittle, Michael c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19214138.0 | 06.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | US201816229757 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US201816229757 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670837 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/28, F01D9/04 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
F01D9/042 (EP,US);
F01D5/282 (US);
F01D5/284 (EP);
F01D9/041 (US);
F01D25/24 (US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
F05D2240/14 (US);
F05D2260/30 (US);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBINENTEIL EINES GASTURBINENTRIEBWERKS MIT SCHAUFELN AUS KERAMISCHEM FASERVERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2020/26] | English: | TURBINE SECTION OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE WITH CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE VANES | [2020/26] | French: | SECTION DE TURBINE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ COMPRENANT DES AUBES EN COMPOSITE À MATRICE CÉRAMIQUE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS63223302 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-15* figure 5 *; | [X]US7670116 (WILSON JR JACK W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 7&8 *; | [X]US2014234118 (BEAUJARD ANTOINE JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2016084096 (CARR JESSE M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 3 *; | [X]US2016123164 (FREEMAN TED J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0043] * * figure 7 * |