EP3792136 - STEERING DEVICE FOR A COUPLING, ESPECIALLY FOR A RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Schwab AG Ebnatstrasse 150A 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLECKO, Marijan Jägerstrasse 19 8200 Neuhausen / CH | 02 /
FAAS, Stefan St. Antonstrasse 13 9050 Appenzell / CH | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19214224.8 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | CH20190001147 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: CH 11472019 | [2021/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792136 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792136 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B61G9/04 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
B61G9/04 (EP,CH);
B61G7/10 (CH);
F16F1/44 (EP);
F16F3/0876 (EP);
F16F3/10 (EP);
F16F2230/0052 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANLENKUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KUPPLUNG, INSBESONDERE EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS | [2021/11] | English: | STEERING DEVICE FOR A COUPLING, ESPECIALLY FOR A RAIL VEHICLE | [2021/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION POUR UN ACCOUPLEMENT, EN PARTICULIER D'UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 13.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | LU | 06.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE6902444U (UERDINGEN AG WAGGONFABRIK [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XI]DE20009859U (SAB WABCO BSI VERKEHRSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 2, 3 * [I] 2-8; | [XI]EP1785329 (VOITH TURBO SCHARFENBERG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1a * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US2012199545 (PECKHAM JASON D [US]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1, 5 * [I] 2-7,9,10 | by applicant | EP3385143 |