|
16.12.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.12.2024 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.12.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2024 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2024 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
47 |
|
29.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
47 |
|
24.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2023 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
46 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.09.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
31 |
|
16.05.2023 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
45 |
|
09.05.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
43 |
|
08.05.2023 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
29 |
|
02.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2828 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
216 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
157 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
233 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
118 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
157 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
2828 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
233 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
118 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
216 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
82 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
141 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
38 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
364 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
396 |
|
02.05.2023 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
372 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
380 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
599 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
381 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2022 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.11.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.02.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
13.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2020 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2020 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
06.12.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
193 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
211 |
|
06.12.2019 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
364 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
372 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
396 |