EP3835238 - CONVEYOR DEVICE AND A METHOD OF STABLY CONVEYING PIECE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASCHPURWIS, Carsten Mainaustr. 212 78464 Konstanz / DE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 19214399.8 | 09.12.2019 | [2021/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835238 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/34, B65G47/84, B65G47/96 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
B65G47/96 (EP);
B65G17/345 (EP);
B65G47/844 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STABILISIERTEN FÖRDERN VON STÜCKGÜTERN | [2021/24] | English: | CONVEYOR DEVICE AND A METHOD OF STABLY CONVEYING PIECE GOODS | [2021/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSPORT STABILISÉ DE MARCHANDISES DE DÉTAIL | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/22] | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1362804 (VANDERLANDE IND NEDERLAND [NL]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US2016257501 (CHIEREGO LORENZO [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] * * figures 1-16 *; | [X]WO0032502 (CRISPLANT AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-14 * page 46, lines 14-17 * * figures 1-33 *; | [X]WO2014159317 (LAITRAM LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-12 *; | [X]JP2004026490 (HOKUSHOO KK) [X] 1,3,4,7-14 * figures 6-8 *; | [X]WO2016014196 (LAITRAM LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-33 * |