Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024315988 | ![]() | 26.09.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US202318385468 | 31.10.2023 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | US202017082949 | 28.10.2020 | US201514776624 | 14.09.2015 | US201816140090 | 24.09.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9956188 | ![]() | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2017239195 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201414214433 | 14.03.2014 | US201715459093 | 15.03.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9636408 | ![]() | 02.05.2017 | B2 | US2014336264 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201414214433 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11839594 | ![]() | 12.12.2023 | B2 | US2021038538 | 11.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | US202017082949 | 28.10.2020 | US201514776624 | 14.09.2015 | US201816140090 | 24.09.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11737991 | ![]() | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2021093585 | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US202017121547 | 14.12.2020 | US201816140105 | 24.09.2018 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | US201514776624 | 14.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10864176 | ![]() | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019022031 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201816140105 | 24.09.2018 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | US201514776624 | 14.09.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10864175 | ![]() | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019022030 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | US201514776624 | 14.09.2015 | US201816140090 | 24.09.2018 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10736859 | ![]() | 11.08.2020 | B2 | US2019282517 | 19.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201815941484 | 30.03.2018 | US201916429852 | 03.06.2019 | US201414214433 | 14.03.2014 | US201715459093 | 15.03.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10322094 | ![]() | 18.06.2019 | B2 | US2018344668 | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201815941484 | 30.03.2018 | US201414214433 | 14.03.2014 | US201715459093 | 15.03.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10117936 | ![]() | 06.11.2018 | B2 | US2016030576 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | US201414776624 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023181495 | ![]() | 21.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | JP2021105582 | 25.06.2021 | JP2019151766 | 22.08.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021143208 | ![]() | 24.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | JP2019151766 | 22.08.2019 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6310542B | ![]() | 11.04.2018 | B2 | JP2016515528 | 30.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL241353 | ![]() | 31.10.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2968992 | ![]() | 15.01.2020 | B8 | EP2968992 | 11.12.2019 | B1 | EP2968992 | 07.09.2016 | A4 | EP2968992 | 20.01.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110152005B | ![]() | 04.08.2023 | B | CN110152005 | 23.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | CN201910263541 | 14.03.2014 | CN201480024011 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105142730B | ![]() | 16.04.2019 | B | CN105142730 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3119755 | ![]() | 28.05.2024 | C | CA3119755 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | CA2904812 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2904812 | ![]() | 20.07.2021 | C | CA2904812 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014233277B | ![]() | 04.04.2019 | B2 | AU2014233277 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3650081 | ![]() | 14.02.2024 | B1 | EP3650081 | 13.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015022095 | 07.12.2021 | B1 | BR112015022095 | 26.11.2019 | A8 | BR112015022095 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1122740T | 12.03.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2968992T | 03.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3650081T | 21.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2769879T | 29.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1218727 | 10.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20200055T | 03.04.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20240648T | 02.08.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP19214535 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2968992T | 25.03.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX370021 | 28.11.2019 | B | MX2015012622 | 31.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX388137 | 19.03.2025 | B | MX2019014200 | 27.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY196014 | 06.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ631152 | 26.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ747040 | 28.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | NZ73006114 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2968992T | 01.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS60015 | 30.04.2020 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS65500 | 28.06.2024 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP19214535 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515361124 | 13.09.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201507124X | 29.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2968992T | 30.04.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3650081T | 28.06.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP19214535 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202000045T | 08.05.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP14762323 | 14.03.2014 | WO2014US29872 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT202400324T | 15.11.2024 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | EP19214535 | 14.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014145156 | ![]() | 08.01.2015 | A3 | WO2014145156 | 18.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019196407 | ![]() | 14.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018087231 | ![]() | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2982441T | 16.10.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3650081T | 16.05.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE047547T | 28.04.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE066883T | 28.09.2024 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3650081T | 10.06.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3650081T | 24.06.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2968992T | 18.02.2020 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3650081T | 18.06.2024 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201707528W | 30.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI661825B | 11.06.2019 | B | TW201519889 | 01.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI740136B | 21.09.2021 | B | TW201936180 | 16.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361792757 | 15.03.2013 | Type | ![]() | EP2968992 |