EP3680112 - COMPOSITE CONSISTING OF A SUPPORT FILM AND TWO ADHESIVE LAYERS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH A COMPOSITE AND SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/29] | COMPOSITE CONSISTING OF A SUPPORT FILM AND AT LEAST ONE APPLIED ADHESIVE LAYER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH A COMPOSITE AND SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT | ||
[2023/38] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Kommandantenstraße 18 10969 Berlin / DE | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blurton, Sven Sundermannstr. 74a 12623 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Antonczik, Boris Mehlbeerenweg 8 16567 Schönfließ / DE | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | [2024/05] |
Former [2020/29] | Mammel und Maser Patentanwälte Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 19214704.9 | 10.12.2019 | [2020/29] | Priority number, date | DE201910100629 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019100629 | [2020/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680112 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3680112 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/24, B42D25/455, B42D25/47, B29C65/48 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
B42D25/24 (EP);
B32B37/025 (EP);
B32B37/1207 (EP);
B32B37/18 (EP);
B42D25/455 (EP);
B42D25/47 (EP);
C09J7/35 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] |
Former [2020/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBUND AUS EINER TRÄGERFOLIE UND ZWEI KLEBESCHICHTEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBZEUGES MIT EINEM SOLCHEN VERBUND SOWIE HALBZEUG | [2023/38] | English: | COMPOSITE CONSISTING OF A SUPPORT FILM AND TWO ADHESIVE LAYERS, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH A COMPOSITE AND SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT | [2023/38] | French: | COMPOSITE À PARTIR D'UNE FEUILLE SUPPORT ET DEUX COUCHES ADHÉSIVES, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DEMI-PRODUIT DOTÉ D'UN TEL COMPOSITE ET DEMI-PRODUIT | [2023/38] |
Former [2020/29] | VERBUND AUS EINER TRÄGERFOLIE UND ZUMINDEST EINER AUFGEBRACHTEN KLEBESCHICHT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBZEUGES MIT EINEM SOLCHEN VERBUND SOWIE HALBZEUG | ||
Former [2020/29] | COMPOSITE CONSISTING OF A SUPPORT FILM AND AT LEAST ONE APPLIED ADHESIVE LAYER, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT COMPRISING SUCH A COMPOSITE AND SEMI-FINISHED PRODUCT | ||
Former [2020/29] | COMPOSITE À PARTIR D'UNE FEUILLE SUPPORT ET D'AU MOINS UNE COUCHE ADHÉSIVE APPLIQUÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DEMI-PRODUIT DOTÉ D'UN TEL COMPOSITE ET DEMI-PRODUIT | Examination procedure | 13.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 15.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
LV | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
PL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
PT | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0054155 (HILTI AG [LI]) [YD] 1,3 * page 3 - page 4 *; | [AD]EP1603757 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [AD] 6,14* the whole document *; | [XA]DE102005052925 (DOERKEN EWALD AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0036] , [0045] * [A] 4-6,14; | [Y]EP3375623 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3 * paragraph [0034] * | by applicant | EP0054155 | EP1603757 | DE102006042488 | EP2873708 |