Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2023 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
29.09.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
21.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.11.2021 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
24.06.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.06.2021 | First examination report | |
19.02.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
15.01.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
15.01.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.06.2020 | Publication of search report | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 | Change - classification | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 | Change - classification | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
15.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
10.12.2019 | Change - representative |