EP3666458 - AUTOMATIC PROCESS PLANNING FOR ROBOTIC DEBURRING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhigang 237 Lisa Dr. South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | 02 /
KLECKA, Michael A. 951 Merrow Road Coventry, Connecticut 06238 / US | 03 /
CHAKRABORTY, Abhijit 56 Barksdale Rd West Hartford, Connecticut 06117 / US | 04 /
GUO, Changsheng 17 Castlewood Drive South Windsor, Connecticut 06074 / US | 05 /
MENDOZA, Jeffrey Michael 87 Waranoke Road Manchester, Connecticut 06040 / US | 06 /
MARCHITTO, Edward 76 Case Street Canton, Connecticut 06019 / US | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19215024.1 | 10.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201816214982 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: US201816214982 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3666458 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3666458 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/00, B25J9/16, B25J11/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
B25J13/085 (EP);
G05B19/4163 (US);
B24B27/003 (EP);
B24B49/16 (EP);
B24B51/00 (EP);
B24B9/00 (EP);
B25J11/006 (EP);
B25J9/163 (EP);
G05B2219/36409 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE PROZESSPLANUNG FÜR ROBOTISCHE ENTGRATUNGSOPERATIONEN | [2020/25] | English: | AUTOMATIC PROCESS PLANNING FOR ROBOTIC DEBURRING OPERATIONS | [2020/25] | French: | PLANIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE DE PROCESSUS POUR DES OPÉRATIONS D'ÉBAVURAGE ROBOTISÉES | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 08.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |