EP3666831 - GLITTER AND ITS USE IN COSMETIC FORMULATIONS, COATING MATERIALS AND PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigmund Lindner GmbH Oberwarmensteinacher Strasse 38 95485 Warmensteinach / DE | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PSCHIERER, Erwin Eichenweg 5 95506 Kastl / DE | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/25] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19215065.4 | 11.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | EP20180212680 | 14.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18212680 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666831 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666831 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/64, A61K8/26, A61K8/02, A61K8/73, A61Q3/02, C09D5/36 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C09D5/36 (EP);
C08J7/06 (CN);
A61K8/26 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/0254 (EP);
A61K8/19 (CN);
A61K8/731 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q19/00 (CN);
A61Q3/02 (EP);
C08L1/02 (CN);
C09C1/644 (EP);
C09D7/65 (CN);
C23C16/12 (US);
A61K2800/10 (US);
A61K2800/26 (CN);
A61K2800/413 (EP);
A61K2800/42 (US);
A61K2800/621 (US);
A61K2800/652 (US);
C01P2004/60 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | C09C1/64, C09C1/00, A61K8/26, B32B7/00, B32B27/00, C09D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GLITTER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG IN KOSMETISCHEN FORMULIERUNGEN, BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN UND KUNSTSTOFFEN | [2020/25] | English: | GLITTER AND ITS USE IN COSMETIC FORMULATIONS, COATING MATERIALS AND PLASTICS | [2020/25] | French: | PAILLETTES ET LEURS UTILISATION DANS DES FORMULATIONS COSMÉTIQUES, DES MATIÈRES DE REVÊTEMENT ET DES MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 30.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 28.09.2023 | |
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 28.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2418089 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [I]EP2918630 (SIGMUND LINDNER GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP3106490 (LEONHARD KURZ STIFTUNG & CO KG [DE]); | by applicant | WO2012137014 |