EP3809006 - AN ANTI-ROTATION DEVICE FOR ROTOR BEARINGS IN GENERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Liangheng 3418 Thunderbird Lane Prairie Grove, IL Illinois 60012 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19215287.4 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201916657015 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US201916657015 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809006 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3809006 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/077, H02K5/173 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F16C35/077 (EP);
H02K7/08 (US);
F16C35/067 (US);
H02K5/1732 (EP);
F16C2204/60 (US);
F16C2226/16 (EP,US);
F16C2380/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERDREHSICHERUNG FÜR ROTORLAGER IN GENERATOREN | [2021/16] | English: | AN ANTI-ROTATION DEVICE FOR ROTOR BEARINGS IN GENERATORS | [2021/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-ROTATION POUR PALIERS DE ROTOR DANS DES GÉNÉRATEURS | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.01.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.01.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2397703 (STALLMAN RALPH F) [X] 1-5,7 * page 1, column l, lines 1-42; figure - *; | [XYI]DE880235 (OBERMANN CARL) [X] 1-10,14 * page 1, lines 31-49; figure - * [Y] 15 [I] 11-13; | [A]JPS62196423 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-8* figure - *; | [A]EP2093439 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 9-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0017]; figure - *; | [Y]US2017159714 (LEMMERS JR GLENN C [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002]; figure - * | Examination | US4652167 |