EP3835740 - A TEMPERATURE DETERMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/52] |
Former [2021/24] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABELANDER, Stefan Am Sennenbusch 8 32052 Herford / DE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/06] |
Former [2021/24] | Kietzmann, Lutz Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19215337.7 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835740 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3835740 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/143, G01K1/10 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G01K1/143 (EP,CN);
G01K3/005 (US);
G01K1/08 (CN,US);
G01K1/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/24] | G01K1/10, G01K1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TEMPERATURBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/24] | English: | A TEMPERATURE DETERMINATION DEVICE | [2021/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102007038060 (ENDRESS & HAUSER WETZER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0014] , [0016] , [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0029]; figure 2 * [I] 5,6,12; | [XI]WO2018105764 (AN GYEONG SU [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] , [0032] , [0040] - [0043] - [0059] - [0063] *[I] 5,6,12 |