EP3666956 - LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS HAVING INDUCTION HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS HAVING INDUCTION HEATER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2023/31] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Woore LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Sangwook LG Electronics Inc. IP Center 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19215926.7 | 13.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | KR20180161338 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180161338 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3666956 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3666956 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/63, // D06F39/04, D06F58/26, D06F105/14, D06F105/48 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
D06F33/63 (EP,KR);
D06F58/30 (US);
D06F18/00 (US);
D06F33/00 (US);
D06F2103/00 (US);
D06F2103/34 (US);
D06F2103/44 (US);
D06F2105/14 (EP,KR);
D06F2105/46 (US);
D06F2105/48 (EP,KR);
D06F39/04 (EP,KR);
D06F58/26 (EP,KR);
D06F58/38 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INDUKTIONSHEIZUNG | [2023/31] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS HAVING INDUCTION HEATER | [2023/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE AYANT UN CHAUFFAGE À INDUCTION | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/25] | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INDUKTIONSHEIZUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2020/25] | LAUNDRY TREATING APPARATUS HAVING INDUCTION HEATER AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | ||
Former [2020/25] | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE AYANT UN CHAUFFAGE À INDUCTION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 13.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.2024 | BG | 07.02.2024 | ES | 07.02.2024 | FI | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | LT | 07.02.2024 | LV | 07.02.2024 | NL | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | SE | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | PT | 07.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
LV | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
PL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
PT | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 07.02.2024 | |
BG | 07.02.2024 | ||
ES | 07.02.2024 | ||
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 07.02.2024 | |
FI | 07.02.2024 | ||
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
LT | 07.02.2024 | ||
NL | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009026646 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1 *; | [A]KR20120106244 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* see machine translation;; figures 1, 3, 4 *; | [Y]EP2623659 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1,2,4,15 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0061]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0077]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0155]; figure 6 *; | [YD]EP3276072 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [YD] 1,2,4,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058]; figure 5 * | by applicant | EP3276072 |