EP3751480 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING ON-STREET PARKING VIOLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISRA, Prasant Kumar Tata Consultancy Services Limited Gopalan Axis H Block, Whitefield 5600066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 02 /
VASAN, ARUNCHANDAR Tata Consultancy Services Limited IITM Research Park 600113 Chennai, Tamil Nadu / IN | 03 /
SUNIL KOMADAM, Krishna Kumar Tata Consultancy Services Limited Global Axis H Block 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 04 /
SIVASUBRAMANIAM, Anand Tata Consultancy Services Limited IITM Research Park 600113 Chennai, Tamilnadu / IN | 05 /
RANJAN, Alok National Institute of Technology National Institute of Technology, Sector 1 769006 Rourkela, Odisha / IN | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19216131.3 | 13.12.2019 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | IN201921023166 | 11.06.2019 Original published format: IN201921023166 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751480 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/063, G06Q50/40, G06Q50/26, G06V20/58 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
G06Q50/40 (EP,US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/23 (US);
G06Q10/063 (EP);
G06Q50/26 (EP);
G06V20/10 (US);
G06V20/582 (EP,US);
G06V20/584 (EP,US);
G06V2201/07 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/51] | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/26, G06Q50/30, G06K9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON PARKVERSTÖSSEN | [2020/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING ON-STREET PARKING VIOLATIONS | [2020/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE VIOLATIONS DE STATIONNEMENT DANS LA RUE | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 25.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.01.2023 | 06.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018116189 (RATTI JAYANT [IN]); | [A]US2018240336 (KAREEV URI [IL], et al); | [I]CN109147340 (PING AN TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD); | [A]US2019096069 (QIAN JIE [CN], et al) |