EP3678457 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING CONTACT POINTS TO A REFERENCE POTENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahner, Ulrich Helmut-Anzeneder-Straße 9 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 19216402.8 | 16.12.2019 | [2020/28] | Priority number, date | DE201910200095 | 07.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200095 | [2020/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678457 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3678457 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/02 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
H01H29/32 (EP,US);
G01R19/165 (US);
H05F3/02 (EP);
H01H9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] |
Former [2020/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN VON KONTAKTSTELLEN MIT EINEM BEZUGSPOTENTIAL | [2020/28] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING CONTACT POINTS TO A REFERENCE POTENTIAL | [2020/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RACCORDEMENT DES POINTS DE CONTACT À UN POTENTIEL DE RÉFÉRENCE | [2020/28] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 04.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2019 | AL | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | CZ | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | ES | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | TR | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | IE | 16.12.2021 | LU | 16.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
TR | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 16.12.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CZ | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
ES | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE112007002875 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE207000 (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME-LAHMEYERWERKE AG) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 38 - page 2, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB190603541 (SIEMENS BROTHERS & CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2005155782 (WESTBERRY WYMAN [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *; | [A] - "Low-voltage electrical installations - Part 4-41: Protection for safety - Protection against electric shock", IEC 60364-4-41:2005, IEC, 3, RUE DE VAREMBÉ, PO BOX 131, CH-1211 GENEVA 20, SWITZERLAND, (20051215), pages 1 - 32, XP082010308 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [411.3.1.2] * | by applicant | DE112007002875 |