EP3670322 - MARINE PROPULSION DEVICE CONTROLLER FOR STARTING/STOPPING ENGINE, MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME, AND ENGINE STARTER OF MARINE PROPULSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKANO, Naoju c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Kentaro c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/26] | Application number, filing date | 19216439.0 | 16.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | JP20180239756 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018239756 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3670322 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3670322 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/21, B63H21/22, B63H20/00 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
B63H21/21 (EP);
B63H20/16 (US);
B63H21/22 (EP);
B63H2020/003 (EP);
B63H2021/216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIFFSANTRIEBSSTEUERUNG ZUM STARTEN/STOPPEN DES MOTORS, SCHIFFSANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN STEUERUNG UND MOTORANLASSER EINER SCHIFFSANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/26] | English: | MARINE PROPULSION DEVICE CONTROLLER FOR STARTING/STOPPING ENGINE, MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM INCLUDING THE SAME, AND ENGINE STARTER OF MARINE PROPULSION DEVICE | [2020/26] | French: | ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION MARINE POUR DÉMARRER/ARRÊTER UN MOTEUR, SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION MARINE LE COMPRENANT ET DÉMARREUR DE MOTEUR DE DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION MARINE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 07.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2019 | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | BG | 19.10.2022 | CY | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | MK | 19.10.2022 | NL | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | IE | 16.12.2022 | LU | 16.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MC | 19.10.2022 | ||
MK | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
MK | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CY | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.12.2019 | |
AL | 19.10.2022 | ||
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NL | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 19.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4850906 (KANNO ISAO [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * figures 1-2 * * column 3, lines 5-10 ** columns 3-4, lines 60-3 *; | [XYI]US2010248560 (ITO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,14,15 * figures 1, 2, 14, 19 * [Y] 8,9,12,13 [I] 5; | [Y]US2010256844 (ITO MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 9 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]US2017349256 (NAKAMURA DAISUKE [JP]) [Y] 8 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0100] * | by applicant | JP2010236474 |