Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
20.02.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.11.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.11.2022 | First examination report | |
10.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.03.2021 | Change - representative | |
22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.12.2020 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
11.12.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.12.2020 | Change - designated states | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
22.05.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
16.12.2019 | Change - representative |