EP3671900 - ELECTROLYTE, BATTERY, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING ELECTROLYTE AND BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 1-6, Shinjuku 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8801 / JP | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hitoshi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19216462.2 | 16.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | JP20180235177 | 17.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018235177 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671900 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M4/04, H01M4/1395, H01M4/38, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, C01G25/00, C04B35/48, C04B35/64 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/058 (CN,US);
H01M10/0562 (EP,CN,US);
C01G33/006 (EP);
C01G35/006 (EP);
C04B35/48 (EP);
C04B35/62615 (EP);
C04B35/6267 (EP);
C04B35/62675 (EP);
C04B35/62685 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (CN);
H01M4/0471 (EP);
H01M4/1395 (EP);
H01M4/362 (US);
H01M4/382 (EP,US);
H01M50/46 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2002/82 (EP);
C01P2002/85 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C04B2235/3203 (EP);
C04B2235/3227 (EP);
C04B2235/3251 (EP);
C04B2235/3294 (EP);
C04B2235/441 (EP);
C04B2235/445 (EP);
C04B2235/48 (EP);
C04B2235/76 (EP);
H01M2300/0071 (EP);
H01M2300/0077 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYT, BATTERIE, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES ELEKTROLYTS UND DER BATTERIE | [2020/26] | English: | ELECTROLYTE, BATTERY, ELECTRONIC APPARATUS, AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING ELECTROLYTE AND BATTERY | [2020/26] | French: | ÉLECTROLYTE, BATTERIE, APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTROLYTE ET BATTERIE | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 04.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015118571 (LIU CAI [CN], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 21] , [0 37] - [0045] - [0 47] * * example 7 * [A] 7,10-15 [I] 2-4,9; | [A]WO2015151144 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0036] *; | [XPA]CN110176627 (JINING KELAITAIGE NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [XP] 1-3 * example 4 * [A] 4-15 | by applicant | JP2011113655 | JP20180235177 |