EP3800122 - AIRCRAFT SEAT WITH SEPARATED SEAT BACK AND SEAT PAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 150 Oak Plaza Blvd. Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 150 Oak Plaza Blvd. Winston- Salem, NC 27105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darbyshire, Martin R. 6 Digby Crescent London, N4 2HR / GB | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 19216731.0 | 16.12.2019 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | US201916590122 | 01.10.2019 Original published format: US201916590122 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800122 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800122 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06, B60N2/30, B60N2/34 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
B64D11/064 (EP,US);
B64D11/0602 (CN);
B60N2/34 (EP);
B60N2/345 (EP);
B64D11/0606 (EP);
B64D11/0639 (CN);
B64D11/0641 (EP,US);
B64D11/0643 (EP,CN);
B64D11/0646 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGSITZ MIT GETRENNTER SITZRÜCKENLEHNE UND SITZSCHALE | [2021/14] | English: | AIRCRAFT SEAT WITH SEPARATED SEAT BACK AND SEAT PAN | [2021/14] | French: | SIÈGE D'AVION DOTÉ D'UN DOSSIER DE SIÈGE ET PLATEAU DE SIÈGE SÉPARÉS | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 05.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010025530 (FERRY DAVID [GB], et al); | [YA]US2010301162 (HANKINSON CHRISTOPHER [GB]); | [X]WO2014064525 (ZODIAK SEATS FRANCE [FR], et al); | [A]WO2018169575 (ZODIAC SEATS US LLC [US]); | [A]EP3514062 (JAMCO CORP [JP]) |